NE LB843 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB843 amended into LB712 by AM2472
Status: Introduced on January 8 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB843 amended into LB712 by AM2472
Summary
Change provisions relating to arson
Title
Change provisions relating to arson
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB843 amended into LB712 by AM2472 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on General File | |
2010-01-28 | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2010 | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-08 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9785 |