NE LB857 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for repayment of certain grants from the Nebraska Environmental Trust Fund as prescribed
Title
Provide for repayment of certain grants from the Nebraska Environmental Trust Fund as prescribed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2012 | |
2012-01-10 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15682 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB857.pdf |