NE LB866 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for appointment of two additional members to the Nebraska Liquor Control Commission
Title
Provide for appointment of two additional members to the Nebraska Liquor Control Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2014 |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2014-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21633 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB866.pdf |