NE LB903 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB903 amended into LB727 by AM1902
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB903 amended into LB727 by AM1902
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt youth sports from sales and use tax
Title
Exempt youth sports from sales and use tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/Portions of LB903 amended into LB727 by AM1902 | |
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-02-01 | Coash name added | |
2012-01-25 | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2012 | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15739 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB903.pdf |