NE LB913 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require a state plan amendment for postpartum coverage under the Children’s Health Insurance Program
Title
Require a state plan amendment for postpartum coverage under the Children’s Health Insurance Program
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM2321 filed |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2321 |
2024-02-05 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2024-01-31 | Legislature | Conrad name added |
2024-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2024 |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |