NE LB967 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1069 amended into LB967 by AM2199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1069 amended into LB967 by AM2199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to accountant licensing examination accreditation, education funding, compensation of members of the Board of Educational Lands and Funds, education regulation, teaching, early childhood education programs, distance education programs, and postsecondary institutions
Title
Change provisions relating to accountant licensing examination accreditation, education funding, compensation of members of the Board of Educational Lands and Funds, education regulation, teaching, early childhood education programs, distance education programs, and postsecondary institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1069 amended into LB967 by AM2199 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB984 amended into LB967 by AM2199 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB958 amended into LB967 by AM2199 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB842 amended into LB967 by AM2199 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB835 amended into LB967 by AM2199 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB754 amended into LB967 by AM2199 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB129 amended into LB967 by AM2462 |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 02, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Kolowski FA285 withdrawn |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Kolowski FA285 filed |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST63 |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Haar AM2462 adopted |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER177 adopted |
2014-03-18 | Legislature | Haar AM2462 filed |
2014-03-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER177 filed |
2014-03-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER177 |
2014-03-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-13 | Legislature | Sullivan AM1712 withdrawn |
2014-03-13 | Legislature | Education AM2199 adopted |
2014-03-11 | Legislature | Education AM2199 filed |
2014-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2199 |
2014-02-04 | Legislature | Education priority bill |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Sullivan AM1712 filed |
2014-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2014 |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |