NE LB991 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit collection of interchange fees by payment card networks on certain taxes and fees
Title
Prohibit collection of interchange fees by payment card networks on certain taxes and fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2014 |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22113 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB991.pdf |