NE LR103 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-17 - Notice of hearing for September 22, 2023
Pending: Legislature General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-17 - Notice of hearing for September 22, 2023
Pending: Legislature General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine entertainment district licenses issued under the Nebraska Liquor Control Act
Title
Interim study to examine entertainment district licenses issued under the Nebraska Liquor Control Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Lowe [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 22, 2023 |
2023-05-23 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-04-19 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=53174 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LR103.pdf |