NE LR238 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-02 - Notice of hearing for September 26, 2023
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-02 - Notice of hearing for September 26, 2023
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the location of recreational vehicle parks, entertainment venues, and other recreational development and the impact of zoning regulations related to flooding on locating such facilities
Title
Interim study to examine the location of recreational vehicle parks, entertainment venues, and other recreational development and the impact of zoning regulations related to flooding on locating such facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 26, 2023 |
2023-05-23 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-05-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=54036 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LR238.pdf |