NE LR40 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-31 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Request the United States Forest Service to reconsider its original decision not to pay a proportionate share of the replacement costs of fences destroyed by wildfires between private and public lands in certain counties
Title
Request the United States Forest Service to reconsider its original decision not to pay a proportionate share of the replacement costs of fences destroyed by wildfires between private and public lands in certain counties
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-31 | Legislature | Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Legislature | Reported to Legislature for further consideration |
2013-02-25 | Legislature | Dubas name added |
2013-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Laid over |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18917 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR40.pdf |