NE LR486 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize August 27, 2024, to September 2, 2024, as Opioid Awareness Week in Nebraska
Title
Recognize August 27, 2024, to September 2, 2024, as Opioid Awareness Week in Nebraska
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Laid over |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=57919 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LR486.pdf |