NH CACR8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Failed Regular Calendar 201-174 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Failed Regular Calendar 201-174 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to firearms. Providing that the legislature make no law restricting the right to own, carry, or use firearms or firearm accessories.
Title
Relating to firearms. Providing that the legislature make no law restricting the right to own, carry, or use firearms or firearm accessories.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - OTPA (Y: 201 N: 174 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Failed Regular Calendar 201-174 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 134 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0516h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 134 |
2021-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0516h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 33 |
2021-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99588247178 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 47 |