NH HB1006 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disclosures required prior to solicitations made on behalf of law enforcement agencies.
Title
Relative to disclosures required prior to solicitations made on behalf of law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-10-29 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |