NH HB1006 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1648s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1648s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to creating a family access motion for the enforcement of parenting plans.
Title
Relative to creating a family access motion for the enforcement of parenting plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Katelyn Kuttab [R] | Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Lorie Ball [R] | Rep. Debra DeSimone [R] |
Rep. Jodi Nelson [R] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Candace Moulton [D] | Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1648s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 12 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0448h and 2024-0553h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | FLAM # 2024-0553h (Rep. Kuttab): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2024-0448h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0448h 02/06/2024 (Vote 14-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 17 |
2024-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2024 10:35 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Children and Family Law |