NH HB1014 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 18
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 9:10 am in Room 101, Legislative Office Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 18
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 9:10 am in Room 101, Legislative Office Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to instruction in government and civics, including information on election laws and voting.
Title
Relative to instruction in government and civics, including information on election laws and voting.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Paige [D] | Rep. Eric Turer [D] | Rep. Hope Damon [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] |
Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. Arthur Ellison [D] |
Rep. Allison Knab [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Hearing: 04/30/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1159h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1159h (NT): Amendment Adopted DV 189-186 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/18/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 22 |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/18/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-22 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2024 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 01/31/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/08/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education |