NH HB103 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the office of right-to-know ombudsman.
Title
Establishing the office of right-to-know ombudsman.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Rep. Peter Torosian [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 18 |
2019-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 11 |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/09/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building208 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 37 |