NH HB104 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a housing appeals board within the attorney general's office.
Title
Establishing a housing appeals board within the attorney general's office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 5 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/31/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 4 |
2019-01-03 | House | Executive Session: 01/15/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building208 |
2019-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/09/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building208 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 37 |