NH HB1057 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Hearing: 03/06/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Hearing: 03/06/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to provisional licenses for new applicants for state emergency medical services licensure.
Title
Relative to provisional licenses for new applicants for state emergency medical services licensure.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Proulx [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/06/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 9 |
2024-01-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/25/2024 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |