NH HB1081 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Hearing: 04/10/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 14
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Hearing: 04/10/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 14
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance payments to ambulance providers.
Title
Relative to insurance payments to ambulance providers.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Proulx [R] | Rep. JD Bernardy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/13/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 4 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2024 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |