NH HB109 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - House Veto Override 06/22/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - House Veto Override 06/22/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0203
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to residential fire sprinklers.
Title
Relative to residential fire sprinklers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - SHALL HB 109 BECOME LAW (Y: 294 N: 72 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - SHALL HB 109 BECOME LAW (Y: 294 N: 72 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | House Veto Override 06/22/2011; Effective 07/01/2011; Chapter 0203 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall HB 109 Become Law: Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Veto Overridden by required two-thirds | |
2011-06-22 | House Veto Overridden: Regular Calendar 294-72 By Required Two-Thirds; House Journal 57, PG.1825-1828 | |
2011-06-16 | House Vetoed By Governor 06/15/2011; House Calendar 49, PG.1680 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1749s (Rep Ferrante): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1582 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1749s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee Amendment 1749s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1749s, 5/11/11; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Hearing: 4/12/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:55 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11, Pg.190 | |
2011-03-16 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0267h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.908-909 | |
2011-03-16 | House Amendment #0267h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.908-909 | |
2011-03-02 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0267h; House Calendar 23, PG.584-585 | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0267h for Mar 15 (Vote 13-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.561 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-02-16 | House Recommit (Rep Ferrante): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 19, PG.437 | |
2011-02-15 | House Special Order to Feb 16: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 17, PG.378 | |
2011-02-15 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Ferrante); House Journal 17, PG.356 | |
2011-02-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 15 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.232 | |
2011-02-01 | House Executive Session: 2/8/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-04 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 8, PG.130 |