NH HB1098 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 15
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to ballots delivered to elder care facilities.
Title
Relative to ballots delivered to elder care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 192-175 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/05/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2024 09:25 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Election Law |