NH HB1112 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0084; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0084; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making technical corrections to the standard valuation law.
Title
Making technical corrections to the standard valuation law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0084; Effective 8/10/2014 |
2014-05-15 | House | Enrolled |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 4/10/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2014-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-02-05 | House | Rescheduled Executive Session: 2/11/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/06/2014 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 =cancelled due to weather= |
2014-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/06/2014 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/30/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |