NH HB1116 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0085; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0085; Effective 8/10/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the membership of the advanced manufacturing education advisory council.
Title
Relative to the membership of the advanced manufacturing education advisory council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/11/2014; Chapter 0085; Effective 8/10/2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Sen. Kelly Moved to Remove HB 1116 from the Consent Calendar |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/24/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing: 3/25/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education and Human Services |
2014-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 2/11/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |