NH HB1120 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to procedures for the county budget and expenditures for Belknap county.
Title
Relative to procedures for the county budget and expenditures for Belknap county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 19 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Municipal and County Government |