NH HB1121 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to creating certain wetlands permit exemptions after a natural disaster or flooding event.
Title
Relative to creating certain wetlands permit exemptions after a natural disaster or flooding event.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1102h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Amendment # 2024-1102h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-03-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1102h 03/13/2024 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 35 |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-24 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/31/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |