NH HB1143 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Hearing: 04/30/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 17
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:10 am in Room 103, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Hearing: 04/30/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 17
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 9:10 am in Room 103, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Including control of cyanobacteria blooms under the New Hampshire clean lakes program.
Title
Including control of cyanobacteria blooms under the New Hampshire clean lakes program.
Sponsors
Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. John MacDonald [R] | Rep. Karel Crawford [R] | Rep. Matthew Coker [D] |
Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. Linda Tanner [D] | Rep. Lorie Ball [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0369h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0369h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0369h 02/07/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |