NH HB1167 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the math learning communities program.
Title
Relative to the math learning communities program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5 |
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 7 |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/17/2024 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 7 |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2024 09:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education |