NH HB1178 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 100, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 100, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to an employee's unused earned time.
Title
Relative to an employee's unused earned time.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Cahill [D] | Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Mark McLean [R] | Rep. Chuck Grassie [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 198 N: 183 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Interim Study (Y: 188 N: 193 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 199 N: 179 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Interim Study (Y: 188 N: 193 NV: 6 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 199 N: 179 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 100, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1256h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-183 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-04-11 | House | Amendment # 2024-1256h: Amendment Adopted DV 197-185 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-04-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 188-193 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-03-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1256h |
2024-03-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 03/28/2024 (Vote 13-11; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/26/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-03-14 | House | Division Work Session: 03/20/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-02-28 | House | Division Work Session: 03/06/2024 02:40 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0783h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | FLAM # 2024-0783h (Rep. M. Cahill): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 199-179 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/14/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2023 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |