NH HB118 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reporting a person as medically unfit to drive.
Title
Relative to reporting a person as medically unfit to drive.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Sen. Gary Lambert [R] | Rep. Brian Rhodes [D] | Rep. Theodoros Rokas [D] |
Rep. Theodoros Rokas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.312 | |
2011-02-03 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 9 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 12, PG.202 | |
2011-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/1/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-19 | House Division I Work Session: 1/25/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-13 | House Division I Work Session: 1/20/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-13 | House Division I Work Session: 1/18/2011 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-13 | House Public Hearing: 1/18/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-03 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 8, PG.130 |