NH HB1182 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1166
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1166
Summary
Relative to return to state employment of recently deployed military personnel.
Title
Relative to return to state employment of recently deployed military personnel.
Sponsors
Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] |
Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1166 | |
2010-02-17 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for March 3 Regular Calendar (vote 9-7); House Calendar 17, PG.820 | |
2010-02-10 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-02-09 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 2/9/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 6, PG.231 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2035&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |