NH HB1196 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1145
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-03 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1145
Summary
Relative to the time period interest is charged on judgments.
Title
Relative to the time period interest is charged on judgments.
Sponsors
Rep. James Craig [D] | Rep. Anthony DiFruscia [R] | Rep. Paul McEachern [D] | Rep. David Nixon [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Russell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1145 | |
2010-02-18 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for March 3 Consent Calendar (vote 14-0); House Calendar 17, PG.804-805 | |
2010-02-09 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 (Continued 2/18/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 If Necessary) | |
2010-01-15 | House Public Hearing: 1/28/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 6, PG.232 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2255&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |