NH HB1198 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/02/2024; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/02/2024; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to liquor stores.
Title
Relative to liquor stores.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/02/2024; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/06/2024 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2024 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/07/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-07 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |