NH HB1203 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing provisions relative to the sale of the former Laconia state school property.
Title
Repealing provisions relative to the sale of the former Laconia state school property.
Sponsors
Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. David Campbell [D] | Sen. James Rausch [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] |
Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-23 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/28/2014; 9:00 Amendment; Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Forrester, Bragdon, and Hosmer; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-14 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Campbell, Cloutier, Chandler, Graham |
2014-05-14 | House | Non-Concur and Request C of C (Rep. Campbell); Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1618s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1618s, Div. 15Y-9N, Amendment Adopted |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1618s, 5/8/14; Senate Calendar 17 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/3/14, Room 103, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 5 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/21/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Public Works and Highways |