NH HB1208 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to notification of pesticide application in residential property.
Title
Relative to notification of pesticide application in residential property.
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Patricia Klee [D] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] |
Rep. Sherry Dutzy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 21 |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 13 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/27/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-02-05 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2020 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 13 |