NH HB1214 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing a committee to study best practices for the development of a restorative justice model for misdemeanor-level behavior and hate crimes committed by juveniles under the age of eighteen.
Title
Relative to establishing a committee to study best practices for the development of a restorative justice model for misdemeanor-level behavior and hate crimes committed by juveniles under the age of eighteen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/23/2024 (Vote 18--2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 6 |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |