NH HB1234 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the repair of class VI roads not maintained by a municipality.
Title
Relative to the repair of class VI roads not maintained by a municipality.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Erf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/07/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 02:40 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Public Works and Highways |