NH HB1235 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - House Signed by the Governor 06/14/2010; Effective 08/13/2010; Chapter 0139
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - House Signed by the Governor 06/14/2010; Effective 08/13/2010; Chapter 0139
Summary
Relative to regulation of dentistry by the board of dental examiners.
Title
Relative to regulation of dentistry by the board of dental examiners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | House Signed by the Governor 06/14/2010; Effective 08/13/2010; Chapter 0139 | |
2010-05-19 | House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.2244 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-13 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2025 Adopted; House Journal 42, PG.2153 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2025 Adopted | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/5/10; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Hearing: April 27, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11, Pg.261 | |
2010-02-17 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0502h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.953 | |
2010-02-17 | House Amendment #0502h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.953 | |
2010-02-11 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0502h; House Calendar 14, PG.625-626 | |
2010-02-11 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0502h for Feb 17 Consent Calendar (Vote 15-1); House Calendar 14, PG.586 | |
2010-02-04 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-02-02 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/9/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-01-29 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-01-20 | House Public Hearing: 1/28/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 6, PG.233 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2371&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |