NH HB1240 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - House Signed by the Governor 05/19/2010; Effective 07/18/2010; Chapter 0072
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-24 - House Signed by the Governor 05/19/2010; Effective 07/18/2010; Chapter 0072
Summary
Relative to the use of state-owned vehicles.
Title
Relative to the use of state-owned vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | House Signed by the Governor 05/19/2010; Effective 07/18/2010; Chapter 0072 | |
2010-04-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 32, PG.1577 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 13, Pg.285 | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.271 | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.269 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 3/31/10; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Hearing: March 23, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration | |
2010-03-03 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0551h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1137-1138 | |
2010-03-03 | House Amendment #0551h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1137-1138 | |
2010-02-17 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0551h; House Calendar 17, PG.841-842 | |
2010-02-17 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0551h for Mar 3 Consent Calendar (Vote 17-1); House Calendar 17, PG.800 | |
2010-02-10 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2010-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 2/11/2010 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 6, PG.233 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2511&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |