NH HB1240 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - House Signed By Governor 05/14/2012; Effective 05/14/2012; Chapter 0056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - House Signed By Governor 05/14/2012; Effective 05/14/2012; Chapter 0056
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to license suspensions for refusal to consent to an alcohol test.
Title
Relative to license suspensions for refusal to consent to an alcohol test.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | House Signed By Governor 05/14/2012; Effective 05/14/2012; Chapter 0056 | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 13, Pg.475 | |
2012-04-25 | House Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.2211 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.379 | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/12; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Hearing: 4/5/12, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7, Pg.185 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0783h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1293-1294 | |
2012-03-07 | House Amendment #0783h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1293-1294 | |
2012-02-23 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0783h; House Calendar 17, PG.982 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0783h for Mar 7 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1059 | |
2012-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2012-01-11 | House =RESCHEDULED=Public Hearing: 2/14/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2012-01-11 | House ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 1/31/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-11-16 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 7, PG.348 |