NH HB1240 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Lay HB1240 on Table (Rep. Layon): Motion Adopted DV 310-54 03/07/2024 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - Lay HB1240 on Table (Rep. Layon): Motion Adopted DV 310-54 03/07/2024 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eating disorders as a qualifying condition for the therapeutic cannabis program.
Title
Relative to eating disorders as a qualifying condition for the therapeutic cannabis program.
Sponsors
Rep. Heath Howard [D] | Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] | Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] | Rep. Alissandra Murray [D] |
Rep. Jodi Newell [D] | Rep. Hope Damon [D] | Rep. Christine Seibert [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Lay HB1240 on Table (Rep. Layon): Motion Adopted DV 310-54 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2024-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/21/2024 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 22 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |