NH HB1243 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 177-135 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 177-135 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the degree-granting authority of an educational institution in New Hampshire.
Title
Relative to the degree-granting authority of an educational institution in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] |
Rep. James Allard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 177-135 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 14 |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0838h |
2020-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 46 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/25/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2020 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 15 |