NH HB1247 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 23; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 23; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to administering oaths to certain state officers.
Title
Relative to administering oaths to certain state officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 23; Eff. 7/14/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2018, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 8 |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 8 |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 4 |