NH HB1313 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-17 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-17 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to highway surveillance.
Title
Relative to highway surveillance.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | House | Died on Table |
2014-03-26 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Steven Smith) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-25 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Kurk) |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/18/2014 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/4/2014 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Transportation |