NH HB1319 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting the nonconsensual dissemination of synthetic sexual images.
Title
Relative to prohibiting the nonconsensual dissemination of synthetic sexual images.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0209h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 |
2024-03-14 | House | Amendment # 2024-0209h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 |
2024-02-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0209h 02/23/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 |