NH HB1322 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting university system funds from being spent to oppose the formation of unions and collective bargaining units.
Title
Prohibiting university system funds from being spent to oppose the formation of unions and collective bargaining units.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Janice Schmidt [D] | Rep. Paul Berch [D] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - OTP (Y: 207 N: 137 NV: 19 Abs: 33) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-137 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 15 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 33 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 P. 18 |