NH HB1339 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to "table stakes games."
Title
Relative to "table stakes games."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202=CONTINUED= |
2014-01-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 2/4/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/31/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/28/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202=RECESSED= |
2014-01-10 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 1/21/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-09 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 1/21/2014 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-09 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2014-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Ways and Means |