NH HB1339 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to motorist duties when approaching highway emergencies.
Title
Relative to motorist duties when approaching highway emergencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 56 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 32 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 7 |