NH HB1347 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to administration of the New Hampshire refugee resettlement program.
Title
Relative to administration of the New Hampshire refugee resettlement program.
Sponsors
Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Jonathan Stone [R] | Rep. Jason Janvrin [R] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] |
Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. Tina Harley [R] | Rep. David Love [R] | Rep. Riche Colcombe [R] |
Sen. William Gannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-03-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 03/06/2024 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-15 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 |