NH HB1359 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1057
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-23 - House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1057
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to exceptions for municipal regulation of hawkers and peddlers.
Title
Relative to exceptions for municipal regulation of hawkers and peddlers.
Sponsors
Rep. Spec Bowers [R] | Rep. Seth Cohn [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1057 | |
2012-02-16 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2012-02-09 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/16/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-01-31 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 2/9/2012 1:18 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-01-31 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/2/2012 2:03 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-01-31 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/2/2012 2:03 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-12-15 | House Public Hearing: 1/24/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 =Banking Div= | |
2011-11-21 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 7, PG.352 |