NH HB1359 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing: 03/26/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 12
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Hearing: 03/26/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 12
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to appeals of certain zoning decisions by abutters.
Title
Relative to appeals of certain zoning decisions by abutters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - OTP (Y: 265 N: 88 NV: 16 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/26/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 265-88 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | FLAM # 2024-0952h (Rep. Pauer): Amendment Failed DV 130-224 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2024-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/21/2024 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 28 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 |